+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 20, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 527 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB295ER)
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 14, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/04 041423540
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2004: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2004: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor