+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0213)
On March 16, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 213 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 28, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB294ER)
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture (22-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 965549633