+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 14, 2010 in the House:
- Failed to pass in House
- No further action taken
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill and substitute returned to the House of Delegates
- Chair ruled that bill is not properly before the Senate
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Speaker ruled Senate substitute 10105866D-S1 not germane
- Passed by temporarily
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 3-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 2-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB293S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105866D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 10105866D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (85-Y 13-N)
- Read third time and passed House (85-Y 13-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 14, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 2-N)
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Judicial Systems
On January 11, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102790D
+ − Votes (8)
March 10, 2010: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 2-N)
March 10, 2010: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 3-N)
March 10, 2010: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
February 16, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (85-Y 13-N)
February 12, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 2-N)
February 8, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor