+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 6-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 075885492-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2926H1
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (23-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety (Sherwood)
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 075885492-H1
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 073325105
+ − Votes (4)
February 14, 2007: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
February 2, 2007: Reported from Appropriations (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor