+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 52 (effective 7/1/20)
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 2, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2020
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB292ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (88-Y 11-N)
- Read third time and passed House (88-Y 11-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB292H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20106898D-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
On December 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102225D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2020: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2020: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2020: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 11-N)
January 29, 2020: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 2-N)
January 27, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Schuyler T. VanValkenburg
Type:
Primary Sponsor