+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Incorporated by Fin. (HB2919-Hogan) (14-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 053115324-H1
- Amendments by Del. Hogan agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute w/amds HB2918EH1
- Printed as engrossed 053115324-EH1
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 053115324-H1
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub (22-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: #1
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 059895324
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 15, 2005: Incorporated by Fin. (HB2919-Hogan) (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 2, 2005: Reported from Finance with sub (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor