+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (104)
On July 22, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0889)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0889)
On May 7, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 889 (effective 5/7/98)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (38-Y 58-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (38-Y 58-N)
- Communicated to Governor
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On April 8, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB29ER)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 4, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On March 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendments rejected by House (3-Y 91-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendments (37-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 2-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (3-Y 91-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- D: Dickinson, Diamonstein, Hall, Callahan, Bloxom, Dillard
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- S: Walker, Chichester, Colgan, Wampler, Gartlan, Stosch
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Floor substitute printed 989843445-H1 (Rust)
- Floor substitute printed 989844445-H2 (Rust)
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 26, 1998 in the House:
- Speaker ruled Rust substitute out of order 989843445-H1
- Ruling of Chair challenged
- Ruling of Chair sustained (52-Y 47-N)
- VOTE: (52-Y 47-N)
- Read second time
- Uncontested Amendments agreed to (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Ruling of Chair challenged
- Ruling of Chair upheld (57-Y 38-N)
- VOTE: (57-Y 38-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Committee amendment agreed to Item 0 #2h (91-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 4-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to Item 138 #2h (96-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to Item 140 #1h (96-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Committee amendment agreed to Item 140 #2g (96-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: (96-Y 1-N)
- Speaker ruled viva voce vote out of order
- Ruling of Chair challenged
- Ruling of Chair sustained (63-Y 31-N)
- VOTE: (63-Y 31-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to Item 140 #3h (93-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Committee amendment agreed to Item 160 #1g (98-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to Item 231 #1g (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Objections withdrawn to certain committee amendments
- Committee amendments agreed to (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Committee amendment agreed to Item 531 #15h (64-Y 36-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (64-Y 36-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to Item 531 #27h (91-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 6-N)
- Passed by temporarily Item 4-2.02 #1h
- Committee amendment agreed to Item 4-2.02 #1h (62-Y 32-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 32-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Substitute by Mr. Rust rejected 989844445-H2 (48-Y 52-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (48-Y 52-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (94-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: (94-Y 5-N)
- Passed House (96-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 25, 1998 in the House:
- Motion for Special and Continuing Order
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (30-Y 0-N)
- Budget amendments available
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/19/97 989800208
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Votes (27)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (38-Y 58-N)
March 17, 1998: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (39-Y 0-N)
March 17, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 2-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (3-Y 91-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: (63-Y 31-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 6-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 32-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (48-Y 52-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: (94-Y 5-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (64-Y 36-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: (52-Y 47-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: (57-Y 38-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 4-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: (96-Y 1-N)
February 23, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (30-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor