+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Left in Commerce and Labor
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 973008176-E
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 973008176
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1997: Reported from C. J. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1997: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor