+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0254)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 254 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB289ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y -0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB289H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105772D-H1
- Read second time
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18105772D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103659D
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N)
February 9, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor