+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 014347768-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amd (24-Y 4-N)
On January 22, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed 014347768
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 6, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
February 1, 2001: Reported from Appropriations with amd (24-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor