+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (54)
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 737 (effective - see bill)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB287ER)
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 18107454D-H2
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (83-Y 13-N 1-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 13-N 1-A)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: DeSteph, Cosgrove, Peake
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Delegates: Simon, Gilbert, Fariss
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 95-N 1-A)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 18107400D-S1 (2-Y 95-N 1-A)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107400D-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB287S1
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107400D-S1
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (89-Y 8-N 1-A)
- Passed House (89-Y 8-N 1-A)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 9-N)
- Read third time and passed House (88-Y 9-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Amendments by Delegate Fariss out of order
- Read second time
- Substitute by Delegate Simon passed by 18106392D-H1
- Engrossed by House as amended HB287E
- Amendments by Delegate Fariss agreed to (50-Y 48-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 48-N)
- Printed as engrossed 18100920D-E
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Floor substitute printed 18106392D-H1 (Simon)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (18-Y 3-N)
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100920D
+ − Votes (11)
March 9, 2018: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N)
March 9, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 13-N 1-A)
March 2, 2018: Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 95-N 1-A)
February 26, 2018: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2018: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 9-N)
February 2, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (89-Y 8-N 1-A)
February 1, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 48-N)
January 23, 2018: Reported from Transportation (18-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor