+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 4, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0710)
On March 24, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 710 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2862ER)
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 2-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (94-Y 2-N)
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amds (14-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute rejected 051694252-H1
- Floor substitute printed 051696252-H2 (Bryant)
- Substitute by Del. Bryant agreed to 051696252-H2
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB2862H2
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Passed House (83-Y 13-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 13-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 051694252-H1
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/substitute (13-Y 2-N)
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 051663252
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 2-N)
February 17, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2005: Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amds (14-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 13-N)
February 4, 2005: Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/substitute (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor