+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology (10-Y 5-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 31-N)
- Read third time and passed House (69-Y 31-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 7-N)
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100589D
+ − Votes (4)
January 27, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 31-N)
January 21, 2014: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 7-N)
January 16, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor