+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0819)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB286ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 819 (effective 7/1/18)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB286ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107081D-S1 (95-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107081D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB286S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107081D-S1
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105921D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB286H1
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18105921D-H1
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #1
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104142D
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources