+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0689)
On March 21, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 689 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2853ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Education
On February 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On January 31, 1997 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 4-N)
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 972723386-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 3
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 972723386
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1997: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 30, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1997: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor