+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0818)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 818 (effective 7/1/18)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB284ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB284ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 18102201D-E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB284E
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #2
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102201D
+ − Votes (11)
April 18, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
April 18, 2018: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 18, 2018: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2018: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2018: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor