+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On April 4, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0850)
On March 26, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 850 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2837ER)
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
- Delegates: Sherwood, Landes, Stump
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senators: Bolling, Ruff, Blevins
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 89-N)
- Senate amendment #3 rejected by House (4-Y 89-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments #1 and #2 agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Sen. Deeds agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amd (14-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2837H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 053956504-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 053956504-H1
- Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 059249504
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
February 24, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2005: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2005: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 89-N)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2005: Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amd (14-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2005: Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor