+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306)
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 306 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2830ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 076068372
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor