+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 313 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0313)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB283ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102115D
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2018: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor