+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 807 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2828ER)
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 032418756-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd (22-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 032418756
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2003: Reported from Finance with amd (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor