+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 28, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0328)
On March 20, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 328 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2827ER)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 2-N)
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N)
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: #2
On January 19, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 053089448
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2005: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N)
February 2, 2005: Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor