+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 4, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0725)
On March 25, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 725 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2826ER)
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 2-N 1-A)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N 1-A)
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 051727102-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2826E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds (23-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: Health & Human Resources
On February 1, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 051727102