+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 17, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0268)
On March 11, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 268 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2822ER)
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 2-N)
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 971356160