+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 22, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0476)
On March 20, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 476 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2820ER)
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 011787684-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd (23-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On January 25, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 011787684
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 15, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2001: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2001: Reported from Finance with amd (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor