+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672)
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 672 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2818ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (73-Y 21-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (73-Y 21-N)
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (35-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 35-N)
- Read third time and passed House (64-Y 35-N)
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (18-Y 4-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 074328212
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (73-Y 21-N)
February 19, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2007: VOTE: (35-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2007: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 35-N)
January 26, 2007: Reported from Privileges and Elections (18-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor