+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747)
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 747 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2807ER)
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (25-Y 9-N 2-A)
- Passed Senate (25-Y 9-N 2-A)
- Committee amendments rejected
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (36-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passed by for the day (36-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government w/amds (12-Y 3-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 5-N 1-A)
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 035099902-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendments (20-Y 1-N)
On January 17, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 035099902
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2003: VOTE: RECONSIDER (36-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (25-Y 9-N 2-A)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: Reported from Local Government w/amds (12-Y 3-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N 1-A)
January 31, 2003: Reported from C. C. T. with amendments (20-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (73)
Type:
Primary Sponsor