+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (52)
On April 10, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0904)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 904 (effective 7/1/97)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2807ER)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's rec. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2807ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 7-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (88-Y 7-N)
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amds. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 20-N)
- Read third time and passed House (79-Y 20-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
- Amendment by Mr. Watkins agreed to
- Amendment by Mr. Reid rejected
- Amendments by Mr. May rejected
- Previous question ordered (76-Y 19-N)
- VOTE: (76-Y 19-N)
- Amendments #1, 2, & 3 by Mr. Wardrup rejected
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. with amd. 972475127-EH1
- Printed as engrossed 972475127-EH1
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 972475127-H1
- Read second time
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 972475127-H1
- Reported from C. C. T. with sub. (20-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 1
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 972468127
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (9)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 7-N)
February 17, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 1-N)
February 14, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: Reported from Transportation w/amds. (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 20-N)
February 3, 1997: VOTE: (76-Y 19-N)
January 31, 1997: Reported from C. C. T. with sub. (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor