+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed 19102462D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
February 1, 2019: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N)
January 30, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor