+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Motion for pending question rejected (50-Y 50-N)
- VOTE: (50-Y 50-N)
- Pending question, not ordered
- Motion for pending question rejected (50-Y 50-N)
- VOTE: PENDING QUESTION (50-Y 50-N)
- Pending question, not ordered
- Substitute by Mr. Day rejected 989662176-H1 (50-Y 50-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 50-N)
- Substitute by Mr. Day reconsidered rejected (19-Y 81-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (19-Y 81-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 989690208-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989690208-H1
- Floor substitute printed 989662176-H2 (Day)
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub. (23-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 989690208-H1
- Read first time
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/19/97 987209208
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (6)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1998: VOTE: (50-Y 50-N)
February 14, 1998: VOTE: PENDING QUESTION (50-Y 50-N)
February 14, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 50-N)
February 14, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (19-Y 81-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance with sub. (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor