+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in C. J. (4-Y 9-N 2-A)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 36-N)
- Read third time and passed House (62-Y 36-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Amendment by Del. McDonnell agreed to
- Amendments by Del. Janis agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 030630836-E
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (16-Y 5-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 17, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 030630836