+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 19, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0414)
On March 15, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 414 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2784ER)
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 4-N)
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (21-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed 974764828
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1997: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1997: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor