+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667)
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 667 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2783ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 073199108-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2783E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 073199108
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 15, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2007: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2007: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor