+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0481)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 481 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB278ER)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 988097860
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor