+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0010)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 10 (effective 7/1/20)
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 24, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 17, 2020
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB278ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 20100666D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB278E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On December 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100666D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 11, 2020: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2020: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2020: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N)
February 10, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2020: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Patrick A. Hope
Type:
Primary Sponsor