+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 27, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0678)
On March 25, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 678 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2778ER)
On February 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 016212972-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from M. & P. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed 016212972
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2001: Reported from M. & P. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor