+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (61)
On April 4, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0709)
On March 24, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 709 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2777ER)
On February 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
- Conference substitute printed 050006384-H2
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on sub. w/amds. (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Delegates: Louderback, Cox, Pollard
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Quayle, Williams, Whipple
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 94-N)
- Senate sub. w/amds. rejected by House (3-Y 94-N)
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 by Sen. Williams agreed to
- Read third time
- Amendment by Sen. Williams withdrawn
- Reading of amendment waived
- Reading of amendment waived
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment #2 by Sen. Williams agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - com. sub. w/amds HB2777S2
- Passed Senate with sub. w/amds. (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Amendment by Sen. Quayle agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 054691384-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 051698384-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 051698384-S1
- Committee substitute printed 054691384-S2
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/sub (14-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2777H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 051687384-H1
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 051687384-H1
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub (23-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: Natural Resources
On January 14, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed 051666468
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
February 26, 2005: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2005: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2005: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 94-N)
February 21, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2005: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2005: Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/sub (14-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2005: Reported from Appropriations with sub (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor