+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0262)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 262 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2776ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 8-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (18-Y 2-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 19104907D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 13, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2019: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N)
January 30, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
January 30, 2019: Reported from Finance (18-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor