+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 25, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0742)
On March 22, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 742 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 6, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2775ER)
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (37-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 5-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 1
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 974247350