+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 31, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0565)
On March 22, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 565 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2772ER)
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (20-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 059230532
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2005: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2005: Reported from Tra. (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor