+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468)
On March 8, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 468 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB277ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB277H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 083554784-H1
- Read second time
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 083554784-H1
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 2, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086267784
+ − Votes (6)
February 26, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2008: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2008: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor