+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0302)
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 302 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2766ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 1-N)
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 076074372
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor