+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 5, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0565)
On March 27, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 565 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2765ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Discharged from Education and Health
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (39-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 4-N 1-A)
- Passed House (89-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: (92-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (92-Y 0-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Read second time
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Education (19-Y 4-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 996356811
- Introduced at the request of Governor
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: (92-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 4-N 1-A)
February 19, 1999: Reported from Education (19-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor