+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0860)
On March 22, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 860 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2765ER)
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (31-Y 8-N)
- Passed Senate (31-Y 8-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (37-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (8-Y 5-N 1-A)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N)
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 6-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 033030736-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 033030736-H1
- Read second time
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 033030736-H1
- Reported from M., P. & P. S. with substitute (20-Y 1-N)
On January 17, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed 033714736
+ − Votes (5)
February 18, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (31-Y 8-N)
February 17, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2003: Reported from R. & S. S. (8-Y 5-N 1-A)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N)
January 31, 2003: Reported from M., P. & P. S. with substitute (20-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor