+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0619)
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 619 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2763ER)
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from M., P. & P. S. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed 032289748
+ − Votes (5)
February 10, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2003: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2003: Reported from M., P. & P. S. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor