+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 20, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
On March 18, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 511 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2753ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 4-N)
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 970613100
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1997: Reported from C. & L. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1997: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor