+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0446)
On March 16, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 446 (effective 3/16/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2752ER)
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 033244604-H1
- Emergency clause added
- Committee substitute agreed to 033244604-H1
- Read second time
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 033244604-H1
- Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/substitute (20-Y 2-N)
On January 17, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 034476604