+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 5, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0480)
On April 1, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 480 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 13, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB275ER)
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Revenue Resources
On February 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 966596396-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 966596396-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 966596396-H1
- Reported from Finance with sub. (19-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 10, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 964807396
+ − Votes (8)
February 29, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 29, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 1996: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1996: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1996: Reported from Finance with sub. (19-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor