+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 1, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464)
On March 26, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 464 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 5, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 1999 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2749ER)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (22-Y 17-N)
- Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (9-Y 8-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 997081212
- Consent to introduce
+ − Votes (5)
February 18, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (22-Y 17-N)
February 17, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1999: Reported from Finance (9-Y 8-N)
February 7, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor