+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 19, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287)
On March 15, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 287 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2749ER)
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 012338716-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Del. Day agreed to
- Committee amendment rejected
- Read second time
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Committee amendments reconsidered
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (23-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 012338716
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2001: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2001: Reported from C. J. with amendment (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor