+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 1, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0652)
On March 23, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 652 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2740ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (14-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 15-N)
- Read third time and passed House (81-Y 15-N)
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N)
On January 18, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: Subcommittee #3...
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 053615488
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2005: Reported from R. & S. S. (14-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 15-N)
February 1, 2005: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor